Trustees ROMNEY MARSH COMMUNITY HUB
Charity number: 1093388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Howard-Healy | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Clayson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy Oliver | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael O'Connor | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Polly Rolfe | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Arthur Joynes | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil James McClure | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Anne Butt | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Mrs Constance Metcalfe | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Waters | Trustee | 21 November 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.