Accounts and annual returns BRIDGING THE GAP SOUTH EAST
Charity number: 1100703
Charity reporting is overdue by 898 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 168 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 168 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 533 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 533 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 898 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 898 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window