Trustees ACTACC
Charity number: 1098009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison May Evans | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guillermo Cristian Martinez Munoz | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeeji Ravish | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Walker | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Boynton | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Seema Agarwal | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Aamer Bashir Ahmed | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Steven | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gudrun Kunst | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Arrowsmith | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.