Trustees 1ST WEALD BROOK SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1096647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN JOHN ASHLEY BATEMAN | Chair | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Nuttall | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Michelle Wilkins | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Dandridge | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adriana Cevoli Giroldo | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Bennett Alexander | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE MORGAN-BATEMAN | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mydge Mareta Clark | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE HELEN ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
BERNARD HENRY MANKTELOW IENG MIET | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.