Trustees The Priory School PTA
Charity number: 1096169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Elizabeth Taylor | Chair | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Gina Northcote | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Farrow-Gent | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Sarah Clint | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Clarke | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollee Louise Vivian | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Crane | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Emma Jeavons | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Beddoe Beldom | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katarina Mingacova | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Williams | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Price | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Candy | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Cripps | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.