Trustees RICHMONDSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LTD
Charity number: 1099607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYAN CAMPBELL JOHNSTON | Chair | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann DAGNALL | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bradbury | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ibbotson | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Jane RYAN | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin William Casson | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Leonard James Upton | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Yates | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Harris | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|||||
JAMES GRAVENOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.