Trustees SMILE (PRESTON) (SELF MOTIVATION IN LASTING ENDORPHINS)
Charity number: 1098658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Castle | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Fletcher | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fawbert | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Threlfall | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Libby Anderson | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Skellorn | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pat Livingstone | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.