Trustees DEBENHAM VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD TRUST
Charity number: 1099705
Charity reporting is up to date (104 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Spurling | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dawn Thurlow | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Simpson | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rob Morris | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Dix | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robbins | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jaynes | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE JAMES DURIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN DURIE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.