Trustees SWANWICK PRE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1098128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Wolden | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wall | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Beveridge | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah O'Hanlon | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances mendam | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Catherine Morley | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Griffiths | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Anna Lisles | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Draper | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Estella Orridge | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Fisher | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JOANNE PICKERING | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Felix | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
LINDSAY WHARTON-HOWETT | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Wardle | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.