Trustees JESUS IN ME INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1101475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theodore Bruun | Chair | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Jervis | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Krueger | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Anderson | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelo Maurice Gonzales | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry Christian Suitt | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lydia Mary Palmer | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Millership | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Szczepanski | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin David price | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAY BARBARA MILLERSHIP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.