Trustees ENERGY INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1097899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Davenport OBE HonFEI | Chair | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Brown OBE FEI | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howie AMEI | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Crewdson Rebora FEI | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rt Hon Charles Hendry CBE HonFEI | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Greg Sean Jackson | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simardeep Soor FEI | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Gross FEI | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aleida Rios FEI | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Currie CEng FEI | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andy Hadland | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR JOANNE WADE FEI | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emily Spearman | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.