Trustees LYDFORD ON FOSSE PARISH HALL
Charity number: 1099268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN JAMESON | Chair | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ann Osborne | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Bridges | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Seehra | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Fleming | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Mitchell | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN PURCELL BSC | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|||||
LINDA ANNE FOOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON JOSEPH WYNN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.