Accounts and annual returns INCAPACITATED REGIONS WATER AID(IRWA)
Charity number: 1100365
Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 373 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 373 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 738 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 738 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window