Trustees OGSTON BIRD CLUB
Charity number: 1101049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Slack | Chair | 24 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gratton | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Annette Jones | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Leslie Simmons | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Taylor | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Walker | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Padley | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woodhouse | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Andrew Guy Kaye | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.