Governing document OXFORD MALAYALEE CLUB
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 1994, AS AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 1995, 24 NOVEMBER 1996, 31 DECEMBER 2001 AND 31 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MALAYALEE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF OXFORD AND SUCH OTHER SURROUNDING AREAS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE (AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 1 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION), IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN ADVANCING EDUCATION, PROTECTION OF HEALTH, OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OF SICKNESS: 2. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES, AND TO THAT END BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE AUTHORITIES AND ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MALAYALEE CHILDREN IN THE MALAYALAM LANGUAGE. 4. ALL OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS NECESSARY TO ATTAIN THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
FOR THE MALAYALEE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF OXFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.