Governance BITTERNE FRIENDS UNITED
Charity number: 1102137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 17 February 2004: Standard registration
- 09 March 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 April 2016: Re-registered
- 09 March 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 April 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- FRIENDS OF BITTERNE C OF E INFANT SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.