Trustees RELATE COVENTRY & WARWICKSHIRE
Charity number: 1103470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zainib Hussain | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Adesola David Adepoju Mr | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Mead | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Robertson | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ashby-Ellis | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Monaghan | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Randhir Auluck | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dunn | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Davies | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES ROBINSON | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.