Governance ARISE LIFE
Charity number: 1105612
Charity reporting is overdue by 196 days
Registration history:
- 24 August 2004: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 January 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 November 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 October 2014: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.