Trustees THE KYNGE'S COLLEGE OF OUR LADYE OF ETON BESYDE WINDESORE
Charity number: 1139086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD WALDEGRAVE OF NORTH HILL | Chair |
|
||||||||
Professor Michael Proctor | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Nicholas David Coleridge | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Frederick William Birney PhD | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Francis Clement Sais Brown PhD | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Peter Vivian | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John McKee | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Baroness Helena Morrissey | Trustee | 03 February 2018 |
|
|||||||
SIR MARK LYALL GRANT | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SIR GEORGE LEGGATT | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MARK ESIRI | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.