Trustees STANLEY OPERA
Charity number: 1105908
Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET MARGARET BACON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Limb | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Christopher Limb | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Butland Mrs | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lawrence | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maria Livia Gheorghina Nute | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICK KARL BACON | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr PATRICIA ATHA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.