Trustees NORTH LEIGH SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1106532
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Mackie | Chair | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nick Morrison | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Hawthorne | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Murphy | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CARLENE KING | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES FRICKEY | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.