Trustees THE LEAMINGTON & WARWICK MODEL RAILWAY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1117232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Collins | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
stephen gary butler | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Reader | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cope | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
chris chennels | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John V Gowers | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Wilcock | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon David Forbes Smith | Trustee | 14 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Roots | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Hutchinson | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEITH CROUCHER | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN RIDGWAY | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.