Accounts and annual returns AMAZON RAINFOREST FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1107242
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 01 December 2007 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 01 December 2007 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 06 November 2006 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 06 November 2006 | 6 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 10 October 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window