Trustees IMAN TRUST
Charity number: 1108716
Charity reporting is up to date (232 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ahmed Abd El-Gawad | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irfan Ullah KHAN | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ahmad Omar | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Azam Ali | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr OMAR SHAIKH | Trustee | 01 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARFARAZ KHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABUBAKER ELBADRI | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMAD AL-JUBOURI | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr IFTIKHAR MOBIN KHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr AKHTAR ALI AKHTAR | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.