Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY SOLENT
Charity number: 1108224
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Hodkinson | Chair | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anna Simonsen | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Pagliaro | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dolan | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Hillier | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mcintosh | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wells | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.