Trustees HEELANDS RANGERS FC
Charity number: 1108688
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERESA MACKENZIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Georgina Cleverley | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Grundon | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Otoo Anakwa | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tom Mirfin | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Bouffler | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Otoo-Anakwa | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLY WEBB | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUCY EVANS | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr LEWIS ELFORD | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.