Trustees APPLETON THORN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1108503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Batey | Chair | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Jones | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Bell | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Miao | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Goodier | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.