Trustees THE THIRD AGE PROJECT
Charity number: 1108521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Eleni Markou | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sujatha Kahawalage Senaratne | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brotherton | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Emma Jacqueline Mitchell | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Oluwafela Felix Ajayi | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vaibhav Negi | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Sorny Garford-Tull | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Celina Pi Ying Ho | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARGARET JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARK ROSS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSS SEMPLE HOUSTON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.