Trustees THE NEW QUEST CLUB
Charity number: 1108916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Edwin Miles | Chair | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Hold | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Turner | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Robson Mr | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sean Edward Foster Mr | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Bartell | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Smith | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Grogan | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.