Trustees THE FRIENDS OF BELL FARM SCHOOL
Charity number: 1109386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Barnfield | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Martha Rule | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Doyle | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Holmes | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satinderjit Metha | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Herringshaw | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Jane Munro | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kate Herringshaw | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Joy Gaydon | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Peter Hunt | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Jane Stewart | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Graham | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Punamdeep Kaur Sofat | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.