Trustees WENDENS AMBO VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1110245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES FREDERICK WILLIAM ARNOLD | Chair | 01 November 1985 |
|
|
||||
Annie Hartley | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Heybrock | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Howitt | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Watson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jo Slota-Newson | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GEOFF CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATE BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.