Trustees DOSTHILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1110139
Charity reporting is overdue by 1487 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikki Thomas | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rushton | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Humpage | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amy Howell | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richsrd Howell | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHURCHES | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clare Matthews | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAYLEIGH NOZEDAR | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Justine Robertson | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hand | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE CLAIRE LEWIS | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.