Accounts and annual returns SIGNPOST GUNTON
Charity number: 1111005
Charity reporting is overdue by 1815 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 354 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 354 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 719 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 719 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1084 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1084 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1449 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1449 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1815 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1815 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window