Trustees NORTHAMPTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1110610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Billingham | Chair | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER ANN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ager | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Brooker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Claris | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
BEN OUSLEY | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Claris | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Gyles | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Humphrey | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Malcomson | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ann Farr Bsc | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LOMAS | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.