Trustees CROUCH END FESTIVAL CHORUS
Charity number: 1110790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicity Anne Ford | Chair | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rae Brister | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Alister Glen Coates McAlpine | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Antonia Best | Trustee | 08 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Alexander Gorrie | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.