Trustees Council of Arab International Relations
Charity number: 1112430
Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Tariq Al Shammari | Chair | 12 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ridha Ameen | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Salim Al Jahwari | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fareed El Sahan | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moanes Al Mardi | Trustee | 07 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.