Trustees GREYLADYES ARTS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1112007
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Clifford Taylor | Chair | 30 January 2021 |
|
|||||
John Dominic Burke | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Reginald Orton | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|||||
MARTIN ANTHONY BRIDGER | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Edwards | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Frederick Rodwell | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stella Gorrod | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charles Shepherd | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trevor George Stephen Clarke | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR J C WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.