LEEDS RUGBY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leeds Rugby Foundation is Leeds Rugby's Registered Charity. The Foundation was formed with the aim of providing high quality sports, health and educational opportunities to people living in Leeds and Yorkshire. The Foundation employs a team of full time Rugby and Sports Development Officers, working with over 300 schools and 80 rugby clubs throughout the Leeds and Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£1,356,224
Donations and legacies | £336.97k | |
Charitable activities | £867.12k | |
Other trading activities | £151.53k | |
Investments | £609 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,345,919
Raising funds | £5.15k | |
Charitable activities | £1.29m | |
Other | £49.32k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £321,703 from 80 government contract(s) and £139,734 from 16 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £54.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.29m | |
Retained for future use | £10.31k |
People
36 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
96 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 21 December 2005: Standard registration
- THE LEEDS RHINOS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- LEEDS RUGBY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Ward | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Fiona Venner | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Birkinshaw | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kairen Brown | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Hill | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon David Pryor | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Wilson | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mariana Pexton | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Clephan | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE DANIEL PETER JONES-BUCHANAN | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46m | £1.24m | £1.15m | £1.39m | £1.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.43m | £1.22m | £1.10m | £1.30m | £1.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.00k | £49.95k | £44.00k | £249.32k | £321.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | £116.22k | £322.97k | £297.33k | £303.17k | £139.73k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £321.57k | £250.78k | £194.04k | £350.76k | £336.97k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £127.92k | £125.69k | £111.98k | £169.75k | £151.53k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.01m | £607.64k | £741.34k | £871.11k | £867.12k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £609 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £251.66k | £100.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.41m | £1.20m | £1.07m | £1.27m | £1.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £1.72k | £9.32k | £22.89k | £5.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.11k | £26.72k | £27.40k | £37.11k | £43.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £15.80k | £19.74k | £25.23k | £9.41k | £49.32k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £252.15k | £185.46k | £110.33k | £81.32k | £68.74k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £498.00k | £695.75k | £659.03k | £595.83k | £690.17k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £409.35k | £526.33k | £370.00k | £187.91k | £259.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 OCTOBER 2005 AND CERT ON CHANGE OF NAME 14/2/06 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 01/09/08 as amended on 10 Dec 2019 as amended on 18 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS AND YORKSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS:- 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY UNION, RUGBY LEAGUE AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LEEDS AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMT Headingley Rugby Stadium
St. Michaels Lane
LEEDS
LS6 3BR
- Phone:
- 01132033207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window