Trustees PEOPLE FIRST MERSEYSIDE COMPANY LIMITED
Charity number: 1124792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Leah Smart | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bullen | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harold Reid | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wilhelmina Mullen | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Holland | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Brigid McConaghy | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Martlew | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Storey | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Grange | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK BURKE | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hume | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDY PHILIP BOWSKILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.