Trustees CULLINGWORTH PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1114082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Heaton | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Reveley | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Damien Leonard | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Darby | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roxanne Hardy | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Halstead | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Higgins | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hutton | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Higgins | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Major | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Knowles | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.