Trustees LEWISHAM EDUCATION ARTS NETWORK (LEAN)
Charity number: 1119396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA JOBBINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Veronica Sarmiento | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Mirkin | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Henry | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Maycock | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Conyard | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dearbhaile Siun Nairn | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Elizabeth Semple | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Webster | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.