Governing document THE ENDOWMENT FUND FOR TACRI
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/06/2015
Charitable objects
(3.1) THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COFFEE PRODUCTION IN TANZANIA AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (B) RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF COFFEE PRODUCERS IN TANZANIA BY ENABLING AND ASSISTING THEM TO IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR NATURAL RESOURCES; AND (C) PROVIDE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO TACRI IN RESPECT OF THE OBJECTS REFERRED TO ABOVE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL AND ADMINISTRATIVE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT IN RESPECT OF THE PROMOTION OF THOSE OBJECTS). (3.2) IN THE OBJECTS: (A) "TACRI" MEANS THE NOT-FOR-PROFIT BODY CORPORATE ESTABLISHED UNDER TANZANIAN LAW ON 9 AUGUST 2000 AND KNOWN AS THE "TANZANIAN COFFEE RESEARCH INSTITUTE" AND SUCH OTHER BODY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER TO BE SUCCESSOR TO TACRI. (B) "TANZANIA" MEANS THE UNITED REPUBLIC OF TANZANIA.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.