Trustees CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF THE IMMACULATE HEART OF MARY, MOTHER OF CHRIST UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 1114445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mother Maureen Akabogu | Chair | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sister Mary Norbert Ezenwanne | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sister Flora Mariae Okwuazu | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sister Maria Clarissa Nwadigbo | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sister Mary Felita Iwenofu | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ann Maris Ezebube | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Maria Ifekristi Okoye | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sister Mary Colette Obika | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Priscilla Ohawuchi | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARY SEBASTIN OGWUIKE | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev SISTER MAUREEN FELICITAS OBIORAH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.