Accounts and annual returns JESUS IS LORD MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1115024
Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 261 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 261 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 626 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 626 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 991 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 991 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1356 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1356 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1722 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1722 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window