Trustees HOME-START WARRINGTON
Charity number: 1116515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Cleminson | Chair | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David McNicholl | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Carey | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clare | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Billington | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bell | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Grylls | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Glass | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bramhall | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Fox | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GWEN LIGHTFOOT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.