Accounts and annual returns THE MARIA WATT BIRMINGHAM FOUNDATION FOR CHILDHOOD AND TEENAGE LEUKAEMIA
Charity number: 1118733
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 167 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 167 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 August 2022 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 August 2022 | 539 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 August 2022 | 539 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 24 October 2020 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | 24 October 2020 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window