Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE EAST DEVON
Charity number: 1115963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Caroline Punton | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gordon Ward | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Duffy | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Victor Holme | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Alder-Westlake JP | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Sheila Whelan | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA SHIRLEY BRADSHAW | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.