Trustees FRIENDS OF SHERFIELD
Charity number: 1117926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty MacInnes | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry-Ann Chamberlain | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Sykes | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Long | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Van Beneden | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hargreaves | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chun Lee | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peta Alvares | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Hannah | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Blackmore | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sherfield School Limited | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.