Accounts and annual returns SINGH SABHA GURDWARA NORTH EAST LONDON
Charity number: 1118011
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 202 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 12 May 2020 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window