Trustees BHOLA'S CHILDREN
Charity number: 1118345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DINAH LEAH CARLOTTA WIENER | Chair | 19 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hogan | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Freda Mary Graf | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nick Breeze | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS ANNE HAMILTON | Trustee | 29 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
MR SANDY ANSON | Trustee | 20 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
BARNABY MARK WIENER | Trustee | 19 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
BRUNA MARIA COLOMBO-OTTEN | Trustee | 19 February 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.